RI S2704 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FOOD AND DRUGS -- KRATOM CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT - Authorizes and regulates the distribution of the product known as "kratom."
Title
Authorizes and regulates the distribution of the product known as "kratom."
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] |
Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2024) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/11/2024) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2704.pdf |