RI S2696 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024)
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024)
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HOLIDAYS AND DAYS OF SPECIAL OBSERVANCE -- DAYS OF SPECIAL OBSERVANCE - Directs the governor to select a day and annually order the lowering of flags to half-mast on any state buildings to honor the passing of first responders.
Title
Directs the governor to select a day and annually order the lowering of flags to half-mast on any state buildings to honor the passing of first responders.
Sponsors
Sen. Victoria Gu [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Holidays And Days Of Special Observance
HOLIDAYS AND DAYS OF SPECIAL OBSERVANCE -- DAYS OF SPECIAL OBSERVANCE
HOLIDAYS AND DAYS OF SPECIAL OBSERVANCE -- DAYS OF SPECIAL OBSERVANCE
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2696.pdf |