RI S2685 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Meeting postponed (03/14/2024)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Meeting postponed (03/14/2024)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- CASUALTY INSURANCE RATING - Prohibits an insurance carrier from assessing a premium surcharge against an insured for making an inquiry regarding the terms of their policy.
Title
Prohibits an insurance carrier from assessing a premium surcharge against an insured for making an inquiry regarding the terms of their policy.
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/14/2024) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2685.pdf |