RI S2415 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PARKS AND RECREATIONAL AREAS -- GENERAL PROVISIONS - Designates Sapowet Marsh Management Area, comprised of two hundred ninety-six (296) acres, more or less, located within the town of Tiverton and Sapowet Cove as open space to be utilized for passive outdoor recreation.
Title
Designates Sapowet Marsh Management Area, comprised of two hundred ninety-six (296) acres, more or less, located within the town of Tiverton and Sapowet Cove as open space to be utilized for passive outdoor recreation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2415.pdf |