RI S2381 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- REGISTRATION OF NURSING ASSISTANTS - Establishes home care nursing assistants licensed by the department of health to work exclusively in home care.
Title
Establishes home care nursing assistants licensed by the department of health to work exclusively in home care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2381.pdf |