RI S2151 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- NET METERING - Modifies the definition of "core forest" to refer to unfragmented forest blocks or single or multiple parcels totaling 250 acres or greater and at least 25 yards from mapped roads.
Title
Modifies the definition of "core forest" to refer to unfragmented forest blocks or single or multiple parcels totaling 250 acres or greater and at least 25 yards from mapped roads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment & Agriculture: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment & Agriculture: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/09/2024) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/03/2024) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |