RI S0506 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Uniform Commercial Code -- Sales: would provide that distributors who make an express warranty pursuant to a consumer sale, would be liable to the representative in an amount equal to that which is charged by the representative for service and repairs rendered to consumers
Title
An Act Relating To Uniform Commercial Code -- Sales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-30 | House passed as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-29 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-28 | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) | |
2011-06-27 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-27 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-07 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-04-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0506.pdf |