RI S0128 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $100,000 To Year Up Providence (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100,000) To Year Up Providence.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $100,000 To Year Up Providence (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100,000) To Year Up Providence.)
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0128.pdf |