RI H8221 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the reporting date from December 2014 to March 2015 for the study commission to report its recommendations to RI DOH and general assembly.
Title
The Rhode Island Lupus Education And Awareness Plan
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Rep. Maria Cimini [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-05 | House | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2014-06-05 | House | House read and passed |
2014-05-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2014) |
2014-05-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |