RI H7976 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS -- CONDITIONAL ESCHEAT OF UNCLAIMED FUNDS IN COURT REGISTRIES - Updates the process by which the Supreme Court reports, holds, and escheats unclaimed property in the court registries.
Title
Updates the process by which the Supreme Court reports, holds, and escheats unclaimed property in the court registries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts And Civil Procedure
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS -- CONDITIONAL ESCHEAT OF UNCLAIMED FUNDS IN COURT REGISTRIES
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS -- CONDITIONAL ESCHEAT OF UNCLAIMED FUNDS IN COURT REGISTRIES
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7976.pdf |