RI H7950 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- SUBDIVISION OF LAND - Provides amendments relative to the permitting authority of, and acceptable forms of financial security permissible for construction and/or improvement guarantees relating to the completion of required public improvements.
Title
Provides amendments relative to the permitting authority of, and acceptable forms of financial security permissible for construction and/or improvement guarantees relating to the completion of required public improvements.
Sponsors
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Cherie Cruz [D] |
Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Brianna Henries [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2024-04-09 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-04-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/09/2024) |
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-03 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |