RI H7919 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
THE CAPITAL DEVELOPMENT PROGRAM - Authorizes the submission of several bond proposals to the people of the state at the general election to be held in November, 2024, relating to capital development and the "cultural economy initiatives."
Title
Authorizes the submission of several bond proposals to the people of the state at the general election to be held in November, 2024, relating to capital development and the "cultural economy initiatives."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7919.pdf |