RI H7861 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the civil penalty for possession of 1 oz or less of marijuana from $150 fine to not less than $100 or more than $200 per offense.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act - Offenses And Penalties
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Rep. Maria Cimini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/16/2014) |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7861.pdf |