RI H7751 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- WEAPONS - Punishes as felony act of unlawfully discharging a firearm or incendiary or explosive substance or device with the intent to hit or fire into any unoccupied dwelling, building, other structure or ship, automobile or other conveyance.
Title
Punishes as felony act of unlawfully discharging a firearm or incendiary or explosive substance or device with the intent to hit or fire into any unoccupied dwelling, building, other structure or ship, automobile or other conveyance.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Dawson [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Jennifer Boylan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2024) |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7751.pdf |