RI H7641 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of dogs under 8 weeks of age unless approval for sale in writing from a licensed Rhode Island veterinarian with violations subject to imprisonment not to exceed 12 months or $1,000, or both. Pounds and shelters are exempt.
Title
Dogs
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2018) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2018-05-31 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/31/2018) |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2018) |
2018-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018) |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |