RI H7582 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES AND OTHER VEHICLES -- REGISTRATION OF VEHICLES - Removes the requirement that the applicant for a Bronze Star Medal license plate pay a registration fee or transfer charge.
Title
Removes the requirement that the applicant for a Bronze Star Medal license plate pay a registration fee or transfer charge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7582.pdf |