RI H7467 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2024)
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Hearing: May 29 House Special Legislation Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2024)
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Hearing: May 29 House Special Legislation Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HOLIDAYS AND DAYS OF SPECIAL OBSERVANCE -- DAYS OF SPECIAL OBSERVANCE - Directs the governor to select a day and annually order the lowering of flags to half-mast on any state buildings to honor the passing of first responders.
Title
Directs the governor to select a day and annually order the lowering of flags to half-mast on any state buildings to honor the passing of first responders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2024) |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2024) |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |
Subjects
Holidays And Days Of Special Observance
HOLIDAYS AND DAYS OF SPECIAL OBSERVANCE -- DAYS OF SPECIAL OBSERVANCE
HOLIDAYS AND DAYS OF SPECIAL OBSERVANCE -- DAYS OF SPECIAL OBSERVANCE
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7467.pdf |