RI H7414 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires educational institutions using dogs or cats for medical research to make animals no longer useful for research available for adoption.
Title
Disposition Of Research Animals
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Committee voted to reconsider |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2018) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2018-04-11 | House | House read and passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/11/2018) |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-03-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |