RI H7341 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM CONTRIBUTIONS AND BENEFITS - Provides state employee public safety professionals with parity to municipal public safety employees in the state/municipal retirement systems eff. 7/1/24 with 10% contribution.
Title
Provides state employee public safety professionals with parity to municipal public safety employees in the state/municipal retirement systems eff. 7/1/24 with 10% contribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Public Officers And Employees
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM CONTRIBUTIONS AND BENEFITS
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM CONTRIBUTIONS AND BENEFITS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7341.pdf |