RI H7093 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require that food and food products derived from or containing genetically modified organisms be labeled as such by the manufacturer, retailer or other person before putting it on the market for sale in RI
Title
Genetically Modified Organisms To Be Labeled
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Maria Cimini [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
Rep. Karen Macbeth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2014) |
2014-01-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-01-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/22/2014) |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7093.pdf |