RI H7036 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the period of a filing of a criminal complaint to the maximum term of the penalty prescribed by the offense.
Title
Preliminary Proceedings In District Courts
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Millea [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2020) |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7036.pdf |