RI H5397 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes a penalty of two thousand dollars ($2,000) upon financial institutions failing to promptly record foreclosure deeds and pay outstanding taxes.
Title
Mortgage Foreclosure And Sale
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Mortgage foreclosure and sale in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-05-31 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-05-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2017) |
2017-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |