RI H5044 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the merger of the Lonsdale and Saylesville Fire Districts in Lincoln if the electors of both fire districts approve that merger.
Title
Relating To The Consolidation Of The Lonsdale Fire District Into The Saylesville Fire District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/14/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2017-04-25 | House | House read and passed |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/25/2017) |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2017) |
2017-03-02 | House | Meeting postponed (03/02/2017) |
2017-02-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2017) |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/19/2017) |
2017-01-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |