PA SB959 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-30 - Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-30 - Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 22, 1951 (P.L.317, No.69), known as The Professional Nursing Law, providing for the definition of "certified registered nurse anesthetist" and for certified registered nurse anesthetists.
Title
Providing for the definition of "certified registered nurse anesthetist" and for certified registered nurse anesthetists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2014-04-28 | House | In the House |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |