PA SB885 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-11 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-11 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating and adopting the River City Brass Band as the official brass band of Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating and adopting the River City Brass Band as the official brass band of Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-09 - Senate - SB 885 PN 984, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-11 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2013-12-09 | House | In the House |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-12-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |