PA SB814 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-14 - Act No. 146
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-14 - Act No. 146
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 22, 1983 (P.L.306, No.84), known as the Board of Vehicles Act, defining "out-of-State recreational vehicle dealer"; further defining "recreational vehicle show"; and further providing for grounds for disciplinary proceedings and for requirements for out-of-State recreational vehicle dealers for recreational vehicle shows, recreational vehicle off-premise sales, recreational exhibitions and recreational vehicle rallies.
Title
Defining "out-of-State recreational vehicle dealer"; further defining "recreational vehicle show"; and further providing for grounds for disciplinary proceedings and for requirements for out-of-State recreational vehicle dealers for recreational vehicle shows, recreational vehicle off-premise sales, recreational exhibitions and recreational vehicle rallies.
Sponsors
Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. Timothy Solobay [D] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] |
Sen. Edwin Erickson [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Michael Waugh [R] |
Sen. Patrick Browne [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-12-09 - Senate - SB 814 PN 1625, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-03 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-14 | House | Act No. 146 |
2014-10-14 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-07 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-07 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-06 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2014-10-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-24 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-24 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-23 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-30 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-12-11 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2013-12-09 | House | In the House |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |