PA SB801 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in certification of teachers, further providing for teacher
Title
In certification of teachers, further providing for teacher
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt Amendment A03457 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |