PA SB560 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 5, 1978 (P.L.1109, No.261), known as the Osteopathic Medical Practice Act, further providing for definitions; and abrogating regulations.
Title
Further providing for definitions; and abrogating regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 560 PN 1293, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended A02615 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02615 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 560 PN 1293, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended A02615 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02615 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2024-03-18 | House | In the House |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-1) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-12-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |