PA SB411 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 27 (Environmental Resources) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in good Samaritan, further providing for findings, for definitions, for eligibility and project inventory, for landowner liability limitation and exceptions, for project liability limitation and exceptions, for exceptions and for water supply replacement; and making editorial changes.
Title
In good Samaritan, further providing for findings, for definitions, for eligibility and project inventory, for landowner liability limitation and exceptions, for project liability limitation and exceptions, for exceptions and for water supply replacement; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-02-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |