PA SB408 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for explanation of ballot question.
Title
In the Secretary of the Commonwealth, further providing for explanation of ballot question.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] |
Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Greg Rothman [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-05-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |