PA SB27 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 176
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 176
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for exchange of information.
Title
In child protective services, further providing for exchange of information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-14 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-02 - Senate - SB 27 PN 1388, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-02 - Senate - SB 27 PN 1388, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | Senate | Act No. 176 |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-10-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-2) |
2014-10-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-07 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-07 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-10-06 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-24 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-10-11 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |
2013-10-02 | House | In the House |
2013-10-02 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-10-01 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-09-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-09-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-09-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |