PA SB1429 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-05-29 - Act No. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act designating the bridge carrying State Route 114 over Interstate 81 in Silver Spring Township, Cumberland County, as the Corporal Paul Walters Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the bridge carrying State Route 114 over Interstate 81 in Silver Spring Township, Cumberland County, as the Corporal Paul Walters Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-23 - SB 1429 PN 1968, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - SB 1429 PN 1968, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-29HouseAct No. 58
2012-05-29HouseApproved by the Governor
2012-05-24HousePresented to the Governor
2012-05-24HouseSigned in House
2012-05-24HouseSigned in Senate
2012-05-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2012-05-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2012-05-22HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2012-05-22HouseSecond consideration
2012-05-09HouseRemoved from table
2012-05-08HouseLaid on the table
2012-05-08HouseFirst consideration
2012-05-08HouseReported as committed
2012-03-29HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2012-03-27HouseIn the House
2012-03-27SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2012-03-26SenateSecond consideration
2012-03-14SenateFirst consideration
2012-03-14SenateReported as committed
2012-02-21SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback