PA SB1429 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-18 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-18 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Transportation, to grant and convey to Parkwood Real Estate Trust LLC, approximately 1.645 acres including a building and all improvements thereon, situate at Parkwood Drive in the City of Allentown and Salisbury Township, Lehigh County.
Title
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Transportation, to grant and convey to Parkwood Real Estate Trust LLC, approximately 1.645 acres including a building and all improvements thereon, situate at Parkwood Drive in the City of Allentown and Salisbury Township, Lehigh County.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Boscola [D] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Raphael Musto [D] |
Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Leanna Washington [D] | Sen. Michael Waugh [R] | Sen. Robert Wonderling [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-06-18 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2008-06-10 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-06-09 | Second consideration | |
2008-06-03 | First consideration | |
2008-06-03 | Reported as committed | |
2008-05-30 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1429 |