PA SB1380 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 3, 1959 (P.L.1688, No.621), known as the Housing Finance Agency Law, further providing for the Pennsylvania Housing Affordability and Rehabilitation Enhancement Fund.
Title
Further providing for the Pennsylvania Housing Affordability and Rehabilitation Enhancement Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |