PA SB1361 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-14 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-14 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, establishing the Ready to Succeed Scholarship Program; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency and the Department of Education.
Title
Establishing the Ready to Succeed Scholarship Program; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency and the Department of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-23 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-23 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-14 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2014-10-08 | House | In the House |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |