PA SB1341 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-06 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-06 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses), 22 (Detectives and Private Police), 23 (Domestic Relations), 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure), 44 (Law and Justice) and 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions, providing for short title of title; codifying provisions relating to the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency, to sheriffs and to crimes victims; and making editorial changes and related repeals.
Title
In preliminary provisions, providing for short title of title; codifying provisions relating to the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency, to sheriffs and to crimes victims; and making editorial changes and related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-06-04 | House | In the House |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-05-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |