PA SB1144 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 8404, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 56 over the Stony Creek River, City of Johnstown, Cambria County, as the PFC Dr. Alex W. Barber Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 8404, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 56 over the Stony Creek River, City of Johnstown, Cambria County, as the PFC Dr. Alex W. Barber Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1144 PN 1484, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2024-04-29 | House | In the House |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-04-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |