PA HR555 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing February 10, 2014, as the 60th anniversary of the addition of the words "under God" to the Pledge of Allegiance of the United States.
Title
Recognizing February 10, 2014, as the 60th anniversary of the addition of the words "under God" to the Pledge of Allegiance of the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2014-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-07-29 | House | Removed from table |
2014-07-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-16 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-07 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-12-18 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |