PA HR279 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Signed in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Signed in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution extending in whole the disaster emergency declared on June 12, 2023, and extended in whole by the General Assembly until November 1, 2023, by Senate Resolution No. 136, and further extended in whole by the General Assembly for an additional 120 calendar days from November 1, 2023, by House Resolution No. 197, in response to the collapse of the northbound bridge and severe compromise of the southbound bridge on Interstate 95 in the City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia County.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution extending in whole the disaster emergency declared on June 12, 2023, and extended in whole by the General Assembly until November 1, 2023, by Senate Resolution No. 136, and further extended in whole by the General Assembly for an additional 120 calendar days from November 1, 2023, by House Resolution No. 197, in response to the collapse of the northbound bridge and severe compromise of the southbound bridge on Interstate 95 in the City of Philadelphia, Philadelphia County.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Bellmon [D] | Rep. Patrick Gallagher [D] | Rep. Joseph Hohenstein [D] | Rep. Eric Nelson [R] |
Rep. Joseph Webster [D] | Rep. Tarik Khan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: HR 279 PN 2440 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - House - House Floor: HR 279 PN 2393 (Y: 179 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: HR 279 PN 2440 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - House - House Floor: HR 279 PN 2393 (Y: 179 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Signed in House |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Adopted (47-1) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2023-12-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-12-13 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2440 |
2023-12-12 | House | Adopted (179-24) |
2023-12-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-12-08 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |