PA HR148 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Adopted (202-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Adopted (202-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating September 18, 2023, as "State Grange Day" in Pennsylvania and celebrating the Pennsylvania State Grange on its 150th anniversary.
Title
Designating September 18, 2023, as "State Grange Day" in Pennsylvania and celebrating the Pennsylvania State Grange on its 150th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-06 - House - House Floor: HR 148 PN 1546 (Y: 202 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-06 | House | Adopted (202-1) |
2023-06-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-06-12 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |