PA HR113 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to conduct a study on how body-worn camera footage can be more effectively used to provide positive and safe outcomes for both law enforcement officers and civilians.
Title
Directing the Joint State Government Commission to conduct a study on how body-worn camera footage can be more effectively used to provide positive and safe outcomes for both law enforcement officers and civilians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-08 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71) |
2023-12-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-05-18 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |