PA HB815 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in primary and election expenses, further providing for reporting by candidate and political committees and other persons, for late contributions and independent expenditures, for oath of compliance, perjury, disqualification from office and commercial use, for residual funds and for place of filing, providing for manner of filing and for inability to file reports or statements electronically by deadline and further providing for late filing fee and certificate of filing, for additional powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth and for reports by business entities and publication by Secretary of the Commonwealth.
Title
In primary and election expenses, further providing for reporting by candidate and political committees and other persons, for late contributions and independent expenditures, for oath of compliance, perjury, disqualification from office and commercial use, for residual funds and for place of filing, providing for manner of filing and for inability to file reports or statements electronically by deadline and further providing for late filing fee and certificate of filing, for additional powers and duties of the Secretary of the Commonwealth and for reports by business entities and publication by Secretary of the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 815 PN 772, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 815 PN 772, 2023 A699 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 815 PN 772, 2023 A676 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 815 PN 772, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 815 PN 772, 2023 A699 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 815 PN 772, 2023 A676 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2023-06-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (102-101) |
2023-06-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-05 | House | Second consideration |
2023-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2023-04-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-04-24 | House | First consideration |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |