PA HB622 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - Act No. 10A of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - Act No. 10A of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the restricted revenue accounts within the State Gaming Fund and from the restricted revenue accounts within the Fantasy Contest Fund and Video Gaming Fund to the Attorney General, the Department of Revenue, the Pennsylvania State Police and the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2024, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023.
Title
Making appropriations from the restricted revenue accounts within the State Gaming Fund and from the restricted revenue accounts within the Fantasy Contest Fund and Video Gaming Fund to the Attorney General, the Department of Revenue, the Pennsylvania State Police and the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2024, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 622 PN 1686, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 622 PN 1686, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A00716 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 622 PN 1131, 2023 A994 (Y: 84 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 622 PN 1686, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A00716 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 622 PN 1131, 2023 A994 (Y: 84 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-11 | Senate | Act No. 10A of 2023 |
2023-07-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2023-07-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-06-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (102-101) |
2023-06-22 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2023-06-21 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-14 | House | Second consideration |
2023-06-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-13 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-06-13 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-05-02 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |