PA HB290 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on November 3 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-11-03 - Act No. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 28, 1953 (P.L.723, No.230), known as the Second Class County Code, in preliminary provisions, providing for adjustments based on Consumer Price Index relating to contracts and purchases; in sheriff and coroner, providing for chief deputy in counties of the second class, for deputies and clerks in counties of the second class and for public list of applicants for deputy sheriff in counties of the second class; and further providing for sheriff's employees and counties of the second class; in contracts, further regulating contracts and purchases; in grounds, property and buildings, further providing for separate specifications and contracts for certain items; and, in sports and exhibition authority, further providing for competition in award of contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, providing for adjustments based on Consumer Price Index relating to contracts and purchases; in sheriff and coroner, providing for chief deputy in counties of the second class, for deputies and clerks in counties of the second class and for public list of applicants for deputy sheriff in counties of the second class; and further providing for sheriff's employees and counties of the second class; in contracts, further regulating contracts and purchases; in grounds, property and buildings, further providing for separate specifications and contracts for certain items; and, in sports and exhibition authority, further providing for competition in award of contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-10-31 - HB 290 PN 2626, CONCUR (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-10-25 - HB 290 PN 2626, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-17 - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-27 - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - HB 290 PN 1436, FP (Y: 122 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-11-03HouseAct No. 89
2011-11-03HouseApproved by the Governor
2011-11-01HousePresented to the Governor
2011-11-01HouseSigned in Senate
2011-10-31HouseSigned in House
2011-10-31HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (196-0)
2011-10-26HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2011-10-26HouseReferred to RULES
2011-10-25HouseIn the House
2011-10-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2011-10-24SenateAmended on third consideration
2011-10-19SenateSecond consideration
2011-10-17SenateRe-reported as amended
2011-09-28SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2011-09-27SenateFirst consideration
2011-09-27SenateReported as amended
2011-04-25SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2011-04-13SenateIn the Senate
2011-04-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (122-76)
2011-04-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2011-04-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2011-04-12HouseSecond consideration
2011-04-06HouseRemoved from table
2011-04-05HouseLaid on the table
2011-04-05HouseFirst consideration
2011-04-05HouseReported as amended
2011-01-27HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2011&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=290
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=0243
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=1436
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=2427
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=2551
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=2626
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=210
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=09/27/2011&rNbr=530
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/17/2011&rNbr=548
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=356
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=819

Bill Comments

feedback