PA HB2428 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 76-25)
Status: Passed on October 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-24 - Act No. 176
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 76-25)
Status: Passed on October 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-24 - Act No. 176
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for issuance and content of driver's licenses.
Title
In licensing of drivers, further providing for issuance and content of driver's licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-17 - Senate - HB 2428 PN 4076, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-01 - House - HB 2428 PN 4076, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-09-25 - House - HB 2428 PN 3632, 2011 A12230, PYLE (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-01 - House - HB 2428 PN 4076, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-09-25 - House - HB 2428 PN 3632, 2011 A12230, PYLE (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-24 | Senate | Act No. 176 |
2012-10-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2012-10-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-10-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-10-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2012-10-02 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2012-10-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-10-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2012-10-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-09-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-09-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2012-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-05 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2012-06-05 | House | First consideration |
2012-06-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2012-06-04 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |