PA HB2415 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-14 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-14 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in municipal authorities, further providing for money of authority.
Title
In municipal authorities, further providing for money of authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-14 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-10-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2014-10-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-07 | House | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-24 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-07-22 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |