PA HB2411 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the offense of endangering welfare of children.
Title
Further providing for the offense of endangering welfare of children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-09 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-10-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2014-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-23 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-16 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-07-22 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |