PA HB2409 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-18)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 144 in Centre County as the PFC Donald Ray Lucas Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 144 in Centre County as the PFC Donald Ray Lucas Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-07 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-10-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2014-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-23 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-17 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-07-09 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |