PA HB2076 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-30 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-30 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in transfers of credits between institutions of higher education, further providing for definitions, for duties of public institutions of higher education and for transfer and articulation oversight committee.
Title
In transfers of credits between institutions of higher education, further providing for definitions, for duties of public institutions of higher education and for transfer and articulation oversight committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2014-09-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-09-22 | House | Final passage (195-3) |
2014-09-22 | House | Third consideration, with amendments |
2014-09-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-17 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-17 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-24 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-30 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-03-25 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |