PA HB1351 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on October 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-23 - Act No. 15 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on October 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-23 - Act No. 15 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, further providing for medical assistance payments for institutional care and providing for emergency transportation services and for case-mix rates for nursing facilities; in Statewide quality care assessment, further providing for definitions, for implementation, for administration, for restricted account and for expiration; continuing the Pennsylvania Rural Health Redesign Center Authority and the Pennsylvania Rural Health Redesign Center Fund; and making a repeal.
Title
In public assistance, further providing for medical assistance payments for institutional care and providing for emergency transportation services and for case-mix rates for nursing facilities; in Statewide quality care assessment, further providing for definitions, for implementation, for administration, for restricted account and for expiration; continuing the Pennsylvania Rural Health Redesign Center Authority and the Pennsylvania Rural Health Redesign Center Fund; and making a repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-18 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1351 PN 2159, CONCURRENCE (Y: 199 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1351 PN 2159, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-10-16 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Adopt Amendment A02562 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-16 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1351 PN 1802, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1351 PN 1493, 2023 A1555 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1351 PN 2159, CONCURRENCE (Y: 199 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1351 PN 2159, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-10-16 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Adopt Amendment A02562 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-16 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1351 PN 1802, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1351 PN 1493, 2023 A1555 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-23 | House | Act No. 15 of 2023 |
2023-10-23 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2023-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2023-10-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2023-10-18 | House | Signed in House |
2023-10-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (199-4) |
2023-10-18 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2023-10-18 | House | Referred to RULES |
2023-10-17 | House | In the House |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Re-referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2023-10-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-07-17 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2023-07-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-07-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-10) |
2023-07-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-29 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-06-07 | House | Referred to HEALTH |